IL HB4500 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that any veteran who holds proof of a service-connected disability from the United States Department of Veterans Affairs, and who has obtained certification from a psychiatrist that the service-connected disability qualifies the veteran for issuance of registration plates or decals to a person with disabilities, may, without the payment of any registration fee, make application to the Secretary of State for disabled veterans license plates displaying the international symbol of access. Amends the Fish and Aquatic Life Code. Provides that, beginning with the 2014 license year, a veteran who holds proof of a service-connected disability from the United States Department of Veterans Affairs, and whose degree of disability has been declared to be 50% or more, shall be eligible for a free fishing license. Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that, beginning with the 2014 license year, a veteran who holds proof of a service-connected disability from the United States Department of Veterans Affairs, and whose degree of disability has been declared to be 50% or more, shall be eligible for a free hunting license. Effective immediately.
Title
HUNTING/FISHING-DISABLED VETS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
515 | 5 | 20-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-609 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4500&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB4500.htm |