IL HB4496 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-7)
Status: Passed on July 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0852
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-7)
Status: Passed on July 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0852
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Plumbing License Law. Provides that by January 1, 2013, the Illinois Department of Public Health shall amend the existing minimum code of standards for plumbing and the fixtures, materials, design, and installation methods of plumbing systems to reflect advances in those technologies and methods that more efficiently utilize natural resources and protect public health. Provides that the Department shall consider the recommendations contained in nationally and internationally recognized plumbing codes and recommendations of nationally and internationally recognized material and equipment testing laboratories so that the State's plumbing code standards are consistent with the leading technologies and methods that more efficiently utilize natural resources and protect public health. Effective immediately.
Title
PLUMBING-CODE OF STANDARDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0852 |
2012-07-26 | House | Effective Date July 26, 2012 |
2012-07-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2012-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-15 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-014-002 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2012 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2012-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 19, 2012 |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 010-001-000 |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2012-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-014-000 |
2012-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2012-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2012-03-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2012-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2012-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2012-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2012-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano |
2012-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2012-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2012-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2012-03-21 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2012-03-21 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) March 30, 2012 |
2012-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2012-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2012-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2012-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Winters |
2012-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2012-02-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2012-02-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2012-02-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly du Buclet |
2012-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2012-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2012-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May |
2012-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Biss |
2012-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2012-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol A. Sente |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 320 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |