IL HB4489 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
Pending: House Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
Pending: House Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that the Department of Transportation shall establish and solely fund bicycle and pedestrian ways in conjunction with the construction, reconstruction, or other change of any State transportation facility in or within one mile of an urban area (rather than in or within one mile of a municipality with a population of over 1,000 people). Allows a county (in addition to a municipality) to opt out of bicycle and pedestrian way construction by passing a resolution stating that a bicycle or pedestrian way does not fit within its development plan.
Title
BIKE/PEDESTRIAN PATH FUNDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-04-05 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 5 | 4-220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |