IL HB4477 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a group health plan or an accident and health insurer offering group or individual health insurance coverage shall not discriminate with respect to participation under the plan or coverage against any health care provider who is acting within the scope of that provider's license or certification under applicable State law. Provides that nothing in the provisions shall be construed as preventing a group health plan, an accident and health insurer, or the Director of Insurance from establishing varying reimbursement rates based on quality or performance measures.
Title
INS-PROVIDER NONDISCRIMINATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | To Insurance Main Subcommittee |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4477&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4477.htm |