IL HB4473 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that the decision to place a minor alleged to be a delinquent minor in detention shall be a last resort and for as short of a time period as possible. Provides that a review of the decision to detain a minor alleged to be a delinquent minor shall be held as soon as possible. Provides that unless sooner released, a minor alleged to be a delinquent minor taken into temporary custody must be brought before a judicial officer as soon as possible but in no event later than 24 hours including weekends and holidays for a detention or shelter care hearing to determine whether he or she shall be further held in custody (rather than within 40 hours exclusive of Saturdays, Sundays, and court-designated holidays). Makes conforming changes.
Title
JUV CT-PERIOD OF DETENTION
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 5-415 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4473&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4473.htm |