IL HB4472 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Health Care Availability and Access Board Act. Establishes the Health Care Availability and Access Board to protect State residents, State and local governments, commercial health plans, health care providers, pharmacies licensed in the State, and other stakeholders within the health care system from the high costs of prescription drug products. Contains provisions concerning Board membership and terms; staff for the Board; Board meetings; circumstances under which Board members must recuse themselves; and other matters. Provides that the Board shall perform the following actions in open session: (i) deliberations on whether to subject a prescription drug product to a cost review; and (ii) any vote on whether to impose an upper payment limit on purchases, payments, and payor reimbursements of prescription drug products in the State. Permits the Board to adopt rules to implement the Act and to enter into a contract with a qualified, independent third party for any service necessary to carry out the powers and duties of the Board. Creates the Health Care Availability and Access Stakeholder Council to provide stakeholder input to assist the Board in making decisions as required by the Act. Contains provisions concerning Council membership, member terms, and other matters. Provides that the Board shall adopt the federal Medicare Maximum Fair Price as the upper payment limit for a prescription drug product intended for use by individuals in the State. Provides that the Attorney General shall have authority to enforce the Act and may pursue any available remedy under State law when enforcing the Act. Effective 180 days after becoming law.
Title
HEALTH CARE AVAILABILITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-10-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-03-12 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2024-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet |
2024-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2024-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2024-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2024-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2024-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2024-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nabeela Syed |