IL HB4471 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that specified quarterly reports of campaign contributions, expenditures, and independent expenditures shall disclose the full name and mailing address of each person who has been compensated in any way, monetarily or with an item redeemable for monetary value, for personal services, compensated for labor, and reimbursed expenses in an aggregate amount in excess of $150 and is not otherwise reported, including the amount, date, and purpose of the compensation.
Title
ELEC CD-REPORTING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2016-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2016-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2016-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | First Reading |
2016-01-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 9-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |