IL HB4470 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Township Code. In provisions concerning meetings for examining and auditing the township and road district accounts, declaring a vacancy, or for adopting rules, provides that a township board may hold a special meeting for those purposes (rather than the board may meet at other times as they determine). Limits the calling of specified meetings upon the request of the supervisor or any 2 board members to meetings for the sole purpose of compliance with the requirement to examine and audit township and road district accounts. Provides for notice requirements for board members and that public notice of the meeting shall be provided in the same manner as special meetings of the board. Effective immediately.
Title
TWP-BOARD MEETINGS ON ACCOUNTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 004-003-000 |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 1 | 80-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4470&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4470.htm |