IL HB4455 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to establish the Recovery Initiative to Support Employment (RISE) Grant Program. Provides that the Department shall allocate $250,000,000, from funds appropriated under the American Rescue Plan Act, as grants to businesses for the purpose of aiding in the employment of persons unemployed as a result of the COVID-19 public health emergency. Provides that eligible businesses shall receive grants in the amount of $5,000. Provides eligibility requirements for businesses seeking grants. Provides that a business shall be eligible for one grant and may be eligible for a second grant. Provides for the adoption of rules. Defines terms.
Title
DCEO-RISE GRANT PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-02-18 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) February 25, 2022 |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |