IL HB4451 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Executive
Pending: Senate Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Executive
Pending: Senate Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Establishes that a municipality that operates an automated speed enforcement system shall set aside 10% of the net proceeds from each system that generates more than $500,000 in revenue for the respective school district or park district in which the automated speed enforcement system is located. Provides that the set aside proceeds may be allocated for any purpose designated by the school district or park district. Set forth home rule provisions.
Title
VEH CD-SPEED CAMERA REVENUE
Sponsors
Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] | Rep. Eva Dina Delgado [D] | Rep. Dave Vella [D] | Rep. Edgar Gonzalez [D] |
Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Yolanda Morris [D] | Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-000 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2024-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2024-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000 |
2024-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000 |
2024-03-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-01-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-208.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |