IL HB4442 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1043
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1043
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code and the Critical Health Problems and Comprehensive Health Education Act. Requires a school district to include in its curriculum a unit of instruction on parenting education for grades 9 through 12 that includes, but is not limited to, instruction on (i) family structure, function, and management, (ii) the prevention of child abuse, (iii) the physical, mental, emotional, social, economic, and psychological aspects of interpersonal and family relationships, and (iv) parenting education competency development that is aligned to the emotional and learning standards of the student's grade level. Provides that this instruction is a prerequisite to receiving a high school diploma and shall be included in the Comprehensive Health Education Program.
Title
SCH CD-PARENTING EDUCATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1043 |
2018-08-23 | House | Effective Date August 23, 2018 |
2018-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-002-000 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-018-000 |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-10 | House | Remains in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported Back To Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; |
2018-04-10 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | To SPECIAL Issues Subcommittee |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-02-12 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 110 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-23.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |