IL HB4442 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Motion to Sustain the Chair - Prevailed 067-047-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Motion to Sustain the Chair - Prevailed 067-047-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Increases the general homestead exemption to $7,500 beginning in taxable year 2009 (now, the general homestead exemption is $6,000 for taxable years 2009 and thereafter).
Title
PROP TX-HOMESTEAD EXEMPTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Motion to Sustain the Chair - Prevailed 067-047-000 | |
2009-05-12 | Shall the Chair be Sustained | |
2009-05-12 | Appeal Ruling of Chair Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-05-12 | Motion Discharge Committee Lost by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-12 | Chair Rules Motion Out of Order | |
2009-05-12 | Objects to Motion Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-05-12 | Motion Filed to Discharge Rules Committee Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-05-12 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt | |
2009-05-07 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-05-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-05-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ronald A. Wait | |
2009-05-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-04-23 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-23 | First Reading | |
2009-04-23 | Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel | |
2009-04-23 | Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-04-23 | Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2009-04-23 | Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-04-23 | Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-04-23 | Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost | |
2009-04-23 | Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. | |
2009-04-23 | Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto | |
2009-04-23 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2009-04-23 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Biggins | |
2009-04-23 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2009-04-23 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger | |
2009-04-23 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4442&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB4442.htm |