IL HB4435 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Complete Streets Act. Requires the Department of Transportation to use federal or State funds allocated for transportation projects to improve safety, access, and mobility for users of the various modes of transportation. Creates the Complete Streets Advisory Board. Provides that the Governor shall appoint members representing various agencies, organizations, or interest groups to the Advisory Board. Provides that the Advisory Board, in coordination with a representative or representatives of the Department, shall prepare a report on the status of the implementation of the Complete Streets Initiative. Provides that the Advisory Board shall submit its initial report and recommendations to the Governor, the Department, and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2022, and annually on January 1 of each subsequent year. Defines the terms "Advisory Board", "Department", "multimodal", "multimodal planning or multimodal transportation planning", and "user or users". Effective immediately.
Title
COMPLETE STREETS ACT
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Rep. Sam Yingling [D] |
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4435&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4435.htm |