IL HB4422 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Provides that no legislator shall receive any income derived from his or her ownership of any gaming-related interest. Requires any legislator holding ownership in a gaming-related interest from which he or she may derive income to divest himself or herself of that interest.
Title
GA ETHICS-GAMING INTEREST
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2020-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4422&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4422.htm |