IL HB4422 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts relating to the governance of public universities and community colleges in Illinois. For any State grant requested after the effective date of the amendatory Act, requires a public university or community college district to provide to the State agency awarding the grant a list of all university or district funds from this State that are invested, excluding endowment funds; the financial status of these investment funds; where the investment funds are held; the amount in fees charged by those holding the investment funds; and who audits the investment funds. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED-INVESTMENT INFO
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Kay [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-15 | House | First Reading |
2016-01-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 305 | 90 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 520 | 75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 660 | 5-185 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 665 | 10-185 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 670 | 15-185 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 675 | 20-190 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 680 | 25-185 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 685 | 30-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 690 | 35-190 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 3-29.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |