IL HB4420 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0852
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0852
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Protection of Individuals with Disabilities in the Criminal Justice System Task Force Act. Changes the date by which the Task Force shall submit its report with findings and recommendations from March 31, 2018 to March 31, 2019. Changes the date on which the Act is repealed from June 30, 2018 to June 30, 2020. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIMINAL JUSTICE-TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-14 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0852 |
2018-08-14 | House | Effective Date August 14, 2018 |
2018-08-14 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Table Amendment - Prevailed |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government; 006-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Special Needs Services; 005-000-000 |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Special Needs Services |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 5115 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5115 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |