IL HB4406 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides for dyslexia screening guidelines and rules. Requires the State Board of Education to employ at least 5 dyslexia specialists or dyslexia therapists with a minimum of 5 years of field experience in screening, identifying, and treating dyslexia and related disorders to provide technical assistance and training. Provides that, beginning with the 2020-2021 school year, each school district must screen students in grades kindergarten through second (and in higher grades under certain circumstances) for the risk factors of dyslexia using a universal screener approved by the State Board. Sets forth what the screening must include. Provides for additional screening for a student who is determined to be at risk, or at some risk, for dyslexia to determine if a student has the characteristics of dyslexia. Requires the use of a multi-tiered system of support framework if screening indicates that a student has some risk factors for dyslexia or has the characteristics of dyslexia. Sets forth provisions concerning exceptions to screening, dyslexia intervention services, and reporting. Effective July 1, 2020.
Title
SCH CD-DYSLEXIA SCREENING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2020-02-18 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-02-18 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Charles Meier |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2020-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.73 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.161 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.66 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4406&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4406.htm |