IL HB4393 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-30 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-30 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning a person's accountability for another person's conduct.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Dena Carli [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-30 | House | Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Dena M. Carli |
2012-03-30 | House | Motion Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2012-03-28 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Dena M. Carli |
2012-03-28 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dena M. Carli |
2012-03-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2012-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dena M. Carli |
2012-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2012-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2012-02-29 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2012-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-30 | House | First Reading |
2012-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |