IL HB4377 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-12)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0672
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-12)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0672
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Passenger Protection Act. Provides that when any person is transporting a child in this State who is under the age of 2 years in a motor vehicle of the first division or motor vehicle of the second division weighing 9,000 pounds or less, he or she shall be responsible for properly securing the child in a rear-facing child restraint system, unless the child weighs 40 or more pounds or is 40 or more inches tall.
Title
REAR-FACING CHILD RESTRAINT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0672 |
2018-08-03 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-03 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-000 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-03-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 25 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |