IL HB4377 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-12)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Child Passenger Protection Act. Provides that when any person is transporting a child in this State who is under the age of 2 years in a motor vehicle of the first division or motor vehicle of the second division weighing 9,000 pounds or less, he or she shall be responsible for properly securing the child in a rear-facing child restraint system, unless the child weighs 40 or more pounds or is 40 or more inches tall.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REAR-FACING CHILD RESTRAINT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateDo Pass Transportation; 012-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-03-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-03-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-06HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2018-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-02-05HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-30HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625254Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback