IL HB4377 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0768
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0768
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Removes provisions requiring all new and used motor vehicle dealers to pay a percentage of certain repairs for power train components. Adds provisions regarding used motor vehicle dealers and auction companies. Provides that used motor vehicle dealers and certain auction companies may not exclude, modify, or disclaim an implied warranty of merchantability before the expiration of the 15th calendar day after delivery of the used motor vehicle or before the used motor vehicle is driven 500 miles after delivery, whichever occurs first. Exempts the sale of antique and collector vehicles from the new provisions. Provides that an implied warranty of merchantability does not extend to damage that occurs after the sale of the used motor vehicle that results from certain conduct, including: off-road use, racing, neglect, and failure to perform regular maintenance. Sets forth remedies and defenses.
Title
CONSUMER FRAUD-USED VEHICLES
Sponsors
Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Eddie Jackson [D] | Rep. Cynthia Soto [D] | Rep. Silvana Tabares [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. John D'Amico [D] | Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Sen. Terry Link [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0768 |
2016-08-12 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2017 |
2016-08-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 118-000-000 |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 118-000-000 |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 118-000-000 |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 016-000-000 |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 016-000-000 |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 016-000-000 |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Consumer Protection Committee |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Consumer Protection Committee |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Consumer Protection Committee |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 |
2016-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Link |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Link |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 011-003-000 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2016 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 011-005-000 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-044-001 |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2016-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 010-001-000 |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee |
2016-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2016-04-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 015-000-000 |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee |
2016-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2016-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2016-01-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 505 | 2L | Amended Code | Citation Text |