IL HB4364 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Removes the requirement that a person be recommended and approved for placement in the impact incarceration program in the court's sentencing order.
Title
CD CORR-IMPACT INCARCERATION
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Davidsmeyer [R] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] |
Rep. Barbara Wheeler [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-001 |
2018-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-8-1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |