IL HB4363 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that a taxpayer who is a family caregiver is eligible to receive a nonrefundable income tax credit in an amount equal to 100% of the eligible expenditures incurred by the taxpayer during the taxable year related to the care of an eligible family member, but not exceed $750 for the same eligible family member. Provides that the term "eligible family member" means a person who: (1) is at least 50 years of age during a taxable year; (2) requires assistance with at least one activity of daily living; (3) is a resident of the State; and (4) is related to the family caregiver. Effective immediately.
Title
INCOME TAX-CAREGIVER CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2020-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-02-05 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-02-04 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Theresa Mah |
2020-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2020-02-04 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4363&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4363.htm |