IL HB4357 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987. Provides that an on-site physician examination prior to the performance of a non-ablative laser procedure shall not be required when: (1) the laser hair removal facility follows a physician supervision protocol, made available to the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation upon request; (2) the procedure is performed by a registered nurse or licensed practical nurse; (3) an advanced practice registered nurse or a physician assistant examines the patient and determines a course of treatment appropriate to the patient prior to a non-ablative laser procedure being performed; and (4) an advanced practice registered nurse, physician assistant, or physician is available for on-site supervision or by telephone or other electronic means to respond promptly to any questions or complications that may occur.
Title
MEDICAL-LASER HAIR REMOVAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2024-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-000-000 |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-000-000 |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 60 | 54.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |