IL HB4352 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0602
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0602
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Sets forth the definition of dyslexia that the State Board of Education must incorporate in both general education and special education (instead of requiring the State Board of Education to adopt rules that incorporate an international definition of dyslexia). Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-DYSLEXIA DEFINITION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0602 |
2016-07-22 | House | Effective Date July 22, 2016 |
2016-07-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2016 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2016 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 013-000-000 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-03-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 024-000-000 |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-12-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-12-02 | House | First Reading |
2015-12-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.161 | Amended Code | Citation Text |