IL HB4344 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that no later than 60 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the corporate authorities of a municipality with a population of fewer than 40,000 inhabitants in which aldermen or trustees are elected for 2-year terms shall adopt an ordinance providing that, at the first election of aldermen or trustees that occurs after July 1, 2018 (if the effective date of the amendatory Act is on or before July 1, 2018) or July 1, 2019 (if the effective date of the amendatory Act is after July 1, 2018), one alderman or trustee shall be elected from each even-numbered ward for a 2-year term and one alderman or trustee shall be elected from each odd-numbered ward for a 4-year term, after which their successors shall be elected for 4-year terms. Prohibits municipalities from reducing the length of the terms from 4 years to 2 years. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STAGGERED TERMS FOR ALDERMEN

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 1, 2018
2018-04-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-04-19HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-01-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6553.1-10-65Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-10-75Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-15-40Amended CodeCitation Text
6553.1-20-22Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback