IL HB4336 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Restores the statutes to the form in which they existed before their amendment by Public Acts 101-652, 102-28, and 102-1104, with certain exceptions. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 concerning aggravating factors for which the death penalty may be imposed. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Eliminates a provision that abolishes the sentence of death. Transfers unobligated and unexpended moneys remaining in the Death Penalty Abolition Fund into the reestablished Capital Litigation Trust Fund. Enacts the Capital Crimes Litigation Act of 2024 and amends the State Appellate Defender Act to add provisions concerning the restoration of the death penalty. Amends the General Provisions, Downstate Police, Downstate Firefighter, Chicago Police, Chicago Firefighter, Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF), State Employees, and State Universities Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. With regard to police officers, firefighters, and similar public safety employees, removes Tier 2 limitations on the amount of salary for annuity purposes; provides that the automatic annual increases to a retirement pension or survivor pension are calculated under the Tier 1 formulas; and provides that the amount of and eligibility for a retirement annuity are calculated under the Tier 1 provisions. Amends the State Finance Act to make conforming changes. Amends the Public Safety Employee Benefits Act concerning health insurance plans of police officers and firefighters. Makes other conforming changes. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation of the amendatory changes to the Illinois Pension Code without reimbursement. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PUBLIC SAFETY-VARIOUS-PENSIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-18 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-04-18 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4336&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4336.htm |