IL HB4336 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Local Library Act. Provides that a library board of trustees' statement of financial requirements necessary for the next year and any amount the library board believes will be necessary to levy taxes for the library's next fiscal year shall be submitted to the governing board of the municipality no less than 60 days prior to when the tax levy must be certified under the Property Tax Code (rather than 60 days after the expiration of the fiscal year). Effective immediately.
Title
LIBRARIES-FINANCIAL REPORTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2016 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2016 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 007-000-000 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-02-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 007-000-000 |
2016-02-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2016-02-04 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2015-12-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-12-02 | House | First Reading |
2015-11-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
75 | 5 | 4-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |