IL HB4330 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Biometric Information Privacy Act. Provides that except to the extent necessary for an employer to conduct background checks or implement employee security protocols, a private entity may not require a person or customer to provide his or her biometric identifier or biometric information as a condition for the provision of goods or services. Provides that the new provisions do not apply to: (i) companies that provide medical services; (ii) law enforcement agencies; or (iii) governmental entities.
Title
BIOMETRIC DATA-COMMERCIAL USE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-23 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 14 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4330&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4330.htm |