IL HB4323 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Construction Law. Defines "school district" to mean a school district or joint agreement. Provides that, for purposes only of determining a joint agreement's eligibility for an entity included in a school construction project grant or a school maintenance project grant, a joint agreement shall be deemed eligible if one or more of its member school districts satisfy the grant index criteria. Provides that the amount of a school construction project grant to an eligible joint agreement shall be determined on a case-by-case basis, based on the needs of the joint agreement in its entirety (instead of using the grant index to calculate the amount). Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CONSTRUCTION-JT AGREEMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-02 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2009-04-02 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-04-02 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2009-04-02 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-04-02 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg | |
2009-04-02 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer | |
2009-04-02 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2009-04-02 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-04-02 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2009-04-02 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy | |
2009-04-02 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 | |
2009-04-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey | |
2009-03-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey | |
2009-03-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 013-006-001 | |
2009-03-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-02-27 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-27 | First Reading | |
2009-02-27 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4323&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB4323.htm |