IL HB4320 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0764
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0764
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Universities Article of the Illinois Pension Code. In a provision that requires an employer to make an additional contribution to the State Universities Retirement System for certain salary increases greater than 6%, provides that the System shall exclude any earnings increase paid in an academic year beginning on or after July 1, 2020 (instead of any earnings increase) resulting from overload work performed in an academic year subsequent to an academic year in which the employer was unable to offer or allow to be conducted overload work due to an emergency declaration limiting such activities. Makes other changes. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-EMPLOYER CONTRIBUTIONS
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Halpin [D] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] |
Sen. Robert Martwick [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0764 |
2022-05-13 | House | Effective Date May 13, 2022 |
2022-05-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass Pensions; 005-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 103-000-001 |
2022-03-02 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-02-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-03 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.46 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 15-155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |