IL HB4316 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
Pending: House Appropriations-General Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
Pending: House Appropriations-General Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $50,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity for a grant to Naperville Community Television. Effective July 1, 2024.
Title
$DCEO-NCTV17
Sponsors
Rep. Janet Yang Rohr [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-01-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-01-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-01-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4316&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/PDF/10300HB4316.pdf |