IL HB4296 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that a neglected minor includes any minor under the age of 12 (rather than 14) years whose parent or other person responsible for the minor's welfare leaves the minor without supervision for an unreasonable period of time without regard for the mental or physical health, safety, or welfare of that minor. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits child abandonment when he or she, as a parent, guardian, or other person having physical custody or control of a child, without regard for the mental or physical health, safety, or welfare of that child, knowingly leaves that child who is under the age of 12 (rather than 13) without supervision by a responsible person over the age of 14 for a period of 24 hours or more.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-NEGLECTED MINOR

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseMotion Withdrawn Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-12HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-01-30HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-01-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-22HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-22HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054052-3Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-21.5Amended CodeCitation Text
720512C-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback