IL HB4288 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Water Rate Protection Act. Contains only a short title provision.
Title
WATER RATE PROTECTION ACT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2014-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-24 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4288&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB4288.htm |