IL HB4282 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act. Provides that nothing in the Act, or any rules adopted by the Department of Public Health under the Act, shall be construed to counteract a provision of the Bill of Rights for the Homeless Act providing that no person's rights, privileges, or access to services may be denied or abridged solely because he or she is homeless.
Title
EMS-HOMELESS RIGHTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 004-000-000 |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 50 | 3.155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4282&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4282.htm |