IL HB4278 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0632
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0632
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Veterans' Affairs Act. Requires that, if an Illinois Veterans Home administrator or a member of the administrative staff is notified that, within one month or less, 2 or more persons residing within the Veterans Home are diagnosed with an infectious disease by a physician licensed to practice medicine in all its branches; a hospital licensed under the Hospital Licensing Act or organized under the University of Illinois Hospital Act; a long-term care facility licensed under the Nursing Home Care Act; a freestanding emergency center licensed under the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act; a local health department; or any other State agency or government entity, then, within 24 hours after the facility is notified of the second diagnosis, the Illinois Veterans Home must: (1) provide a written notification of the incidence of the infectious disease to each resident of the facility and the resident's emergency contact or next of kin; (2) post a notification of the incidence of the infectious disease in a conspicuous place near the main entrance to the Illinois Veterans Home; and (3) provide a written notification to the Department of Veterans' Affairs and the Department of Public Health of the incidence of the infectious disease and of compliance with the notification requirements concerning residents and the resident's emergency contact or next of kin. Requires that, in addition to the initial written notifications, the Veterans Home must provide written notifications of any updates on the incidence of the infectious disease and any options that are available to the residents. Provides that the Department of Veterans' Affairs and the Department of Public Health must post the notification of the incidence of the infectious disease, any updates, and any options that are available to the residents on their websites. Effective immediately.
Title
VETERANS HOME-NOTICE-DISEASE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0632 |
2018-07-27 | House | Effective Date July 27, 2018 |
2018-07-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-10 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-04-03 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2018-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-01-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-01-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-01-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-01-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |