IL HB4275 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0658
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0658
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Physical Fitness Services Act. Provides that no contract for basic physical fitness services shall require payment of a total amount in excess of $6,500 (rather than $2500) per year, with certain exceptions; and that no contract for family or couple memberships for basic physical fitness services shall require payment in excess of $6,500 (rather than $2,500) per year per person covered under the membership. In a provision permitting a person to renew a contract for physical fitness services for consecutive periods of not more than one year each, removes the requirement that each renewal be for a reasonable consideration not less than 10% of the cash price of the original membership. Effective June 1, 2018.
Title
HLTH CLUB MEMBERSHIP FEE LIMIT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 84 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 84 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-01 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0658 |
2018-08-01 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-01 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-005-000 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 008-000-001 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-025-001 |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 005-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 4 Adopted in Consumer Protection Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee |
2018-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-02-12 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 645 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |