IL HB4254 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Good Samaritan Act. Provides that any not-for-profit organization in this State or any person working at the organization who in good faith provides temporary or emergency overnight shelter without fee to a person experiencing homelessness shall not be liable for civil damages as a result of acts or omissions, except for willful or wanton misconduct on the part of the person or organization in providing the temporary or emergency overnight shelter. Provides that the new provisions do not apply to an organization whose primary purpose is to provide shelter to the homeless.
Title
GOOD SAMARITAN-TEMP SHELTER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Tabled |
2018-04-10 | House | Tabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g)-5 |
2018-04-10 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 001-002-000; -FAILED |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-03-07 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-03-07 | House | Remains in Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 001-002-000; -FAILED |
2018-02-13 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |