IL HB4247 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-08 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-08 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Public Higher Education Act. Provides that the intent of the Act is for the requirements of the Act to apply equally to the governing board of each public institution of higher education in this State. Defines "governing board of each public institution of higher education" and "public institution of higher education". Adds provisions requiring each public institution of higher education to make emergency contraception available for purchase through at least one vending machine located on each campus under its jurisdiction; defines "emergency contraception". Sets forth minimum requirements concerning the packaging, storage, cost, and dispensing of the emergency contraception. Effective immediately.
Title
EDUC-EMERGENCY CONTRACEPTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 38 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-07-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-07-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-07-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-038-002 |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2022-03-02 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-03-02 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2022-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 006-004-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 006-003-000 |
2022-02-24 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Avery Bourne |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Avery Bourne |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Avery Bourne |
2022-02-22 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-02-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2022-02-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 006-004-000 |
2022-02-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2021-12-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |