IL HB4244 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on November 29 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 29 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In provisions concerning the Low-Income Senior Citizens Assessment Freeze Homestead Exemption, provides that the term "household" does not include an exempt family member who uses the residence as his or her principal place of residence for less than 12 months during the taxable year. Provides that the term "exempt family member" means the applicant's son, daughter, stepson, or stepdaughter and the spouse of the applicant's son, daughter, stepson, or stepdaughter. Provides that the maximum income limitation amount is $80,000 (rather than $65,000).
Title
PROP TAX-HOMESTEAD EXEMPTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-08 | House | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
2024-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2024-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2024-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha |
2024-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2024-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer |
2024-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2023-11-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jed Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4244&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4244.htm |