IL HB4238 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-21)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Rebuild Illinois Mental Health Workforce Act. Provides that the purpose of the Act is to preserve and expand access to Medicaid community mental health care in Illinois to prevent unnecessary hospitalizations and avoid the criminalization of mental health conditions. Establishes add-on payments for the following community mental health services to be paid beginning with State Fiscal Year 2023 and continuing for each State fiscal year thereafter: individual therapy services; community support-individual services; case management services; and assertive community treatment services. Requires monthly directed payments to community mental health providers of community support team services or assertive community treatment services. Provides that such directed payments shall be based on the number of Medicaid users, as defined, who receive services from the provider in the base year. Provides that the add-on payments established under the Act shall apply to Medicaid services provided by a contracted managed care organization or entity and services paid for directly by the Department of Healthcare and Family Services. Provides that no base Medicaid rate or Medicaid rate add-on payment or any other payment for the provision of Medicaid community mental health services in place on July 1, 2021 shall be diminished or changed to make the reimbursement changes required under the Act. Requires the Department to apply for federal approval to implement the Act. Provides that implementation of the add-on payments is conditioned on the receipt of federal financial participation for such payments. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-MENTAL HEALTH

Sponsors

Rep. Gregory Harris [D]Rep. Tom Demmer [R]Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D]Rep. Deborah Conroy [D]
Rep. Kambium Buckner [D]Rep. Ryan Spain [R]Rep. Robyn Gabel [D]Rep. Mark Walker [D]
Rep. Michelle Mussman [D]Rep. Anna Moeller [D]Rep. Margaret Croke [D]Rep. Kathleen Willis [D]
Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D]Rep. Lakesia Collins [D]Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D]Rep. Lindsey LaPointe [D]
Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D]Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D]Rep. Daniel Didech [D]Rep. Theresa Mah [D]
Rep. Michael Halpin [D]Rep. Ann Williams [D]Rep. Natalie Manley [D]Rep. Justin Slaughter [D]
Rep. Delia Ramirez [D]Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D]Rep. Suzanne Ness [D]Rep. Timothy Butler [R]
Rep. Charles Meier [R]Rep. Maurice West [D]Rep. Michael Kelly [D]Rep. Frances Hurley [D]
Rep. Katie Stuart [D]Rep. Sue Scherer [D]Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback [D]Rep. Amy Elik [R]
Rep. Bob Morgan [D]Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R]Rep. Aaron Ortiz [D]Rep. Norine Hammond [R]
Rep. Jackie Haas [R]Rep. Amy Grant [R]Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar [D]Rep. Deanne Mazzochi [R]
Rep. Jeff Keicher [R]Rep. Camille Lilly [D]Rep. Joyce Mason [D]Rep. Kelly Burke [D]
Rep. Dagmara Avelar [D]Rep. Janet Yang Rohr [D]Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D]Rep. Maura Hirschauer [D]
Rep. Will Guzzardi [D]Rep. LaShawn Ford [D]Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D]Rep. Dan Brady [R]
Rep. Lamont Robinson [D]Rep. Jay Hoffman [D]Rep. Dave Vella [D]Rep. Jaime Andrade [D]
Rep. James Durkin [R]Rep. Steven Reick [R]Rep. Thomas Bennett [R]Rep. William Davis [D]
Rep. Sam Yingling [D]Rep. Emanuel Welch [D]Rep. Bradley Stephens [R]Rep. Chris Bos [R]
Rep. Daniel Swanson [R]Rep. Paul Jacobs [R]Rep. Michael Zalewski [D]Rep. Dave Severin [R]
Rep. Randy Frese [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2022-02-25HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2022-02-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2022-02-18HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) February 25, 2022
2022-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2022-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2022-01-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
2022-01-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2022-01-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos
2022-01-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2022-01-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens
2022-01-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2022-01-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2022-01-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2022-01-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris
2022-01-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2022-01-11HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2022-01-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2022-01-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2022-01-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2022-01-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2022-01-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
2022-01-05HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2022-01-05HouseFirst Reading
2022-01-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2022-01-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2022-01-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2022-01-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2022-01-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2022-01-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2022-01-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
2022-01-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2022-01-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
2022-01-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2022-01-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2021-12-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2021-12-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2021-12-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
2021-12-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2021-12-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
2021-12-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2021-12-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
2021-12-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2021-12-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2021-12-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2021-12-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2021-12-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
2021-12-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback
2021-12-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2021-12-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2021-12-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2021-12-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly
2021-12-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2021-12-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2021-12-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2021-12-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness
2021-12-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2021-12-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2021-12-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2021-12-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2021-12-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2021-12-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2021-12-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2021-12-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2021-12-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2021-12-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2021-12-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2021-12-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-12-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
2021-12-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-12-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2021-12-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
2021-12-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2021-12-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2021-12-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2021-12-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2021-12-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2021-11-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2021-11-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2021-11-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-11-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2021-11-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback