IL HB4215 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-04 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-04 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Victims' Economic Security and Safety Act. Defines "first responder". Provides that an employee may take unpaid leave from work for specified reasons relating to a family or household member who is killed in a crime of violence. Provides that an employee shall be entitled to a total of not more than 2 workweeks of unpaid leave for specified reasons relating to a family or household member who is killed in a crime of violence, which must be completed within 60 days after the death of the victim. Provides that unpaid leave time taken for these purposes shall be counted toward, and is not in addition to, other leave time the employee is entitled to under the Act and the Child Bereavement Leave Act.
Title
CHILD EXTENDED BEREAVEMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-04 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2023-01-04 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2023-01-04 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-04 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-04 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2023-01-04 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2023-01-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2022-05-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2022-04-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Villa |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Villa |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 017-000-000 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-004-000 |
2022-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-011-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-01-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-01-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-010-000 |
2022-01-11 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2021-11-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |