IL HB4213 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0651
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0651
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that notwithstanding any State policy or rule to the contrary, any State-owned motor vehicle requiring maintenance in the form of an oil change shall have such maintenance performed according to the applicable Department of Central Management Services policy which considers the manufacturer's suggested oil change frequency for that vehicle's particular make, model, and year. Provides that the Department shall evaluate the original equipment manufacturer's oil change interval recommendations and other related impacts periodically and consider policy adjustments as is cost and operationally efficient for the State. Provides legislative intent.
Title
CMS-STATE OWNED VEHICLES
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] | Rep. Nicholas Sauer [R] |
Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0651 |
2018-07-31 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-07-31 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2018-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-01-24 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 405 | 405-280 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 405 | 67.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |