IL HB4212 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-27 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-27 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Prevention of Tobacco Use by Minors and Sale and Distribution of Tobacco Products Act. Provides that a violation of the Act involving the sale or distribution of single or loose cigarettes that are not contained within a sealed container, pack, or package to persons who are 18 years of age or older is a petty offense punishable by a fine of not more than $50, which may be satisfied without a court appearance by a written plea of guilty and payment of all applicable fines, penalties, and costs. Amends the Cigarette Tax Act and the Cigarette Use Tax Act to provide that those violations shall be subject only to the penalties provided in the Prevention of Tobacco Use by Minors and Sale and Distribution of Tobacco Products Act.
Title
TOBACCO-SINGLE CIGARETTE
Sponsors
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] |
Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 12, 2016 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 060-052-000 |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 005-002-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-05 | House | First Reading |
2015-05-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 130 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 135 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 675 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |