IL HB4211 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 046-065-001
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 046-065-001
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as the Payment Non-discrimination Act. Amends the Landlord and Tenant Act. Provides that a lessor of residential real estate may not require a lessee to use an electronic system as the only method for the payment of rent. Provides that a lessor may offer a discount in exchange for the lessee to use an electronic system to pay rent, but may not assess any fee or other charge if a lessee chooses not to use an electronic system. Provides that an agreement by a lessee in a residential dwelling that waives or modifies his or her rights under the new provisions is void and unenforceable as contrary to public policy.
Title
RENT PAYMENT-ELECTRONIC MEANS
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Franks [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 46 N: 65 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 046-065-001 |
2014-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 010-006-000 |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-15 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |