IL HB4203 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-8)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriations to the Department of Human Services for the Home Services Program and for all costs and administrative expenses associated with the Community Reintegration Program. Effective July 1, 2015.
Title
$GRANTS-HOME SERVICES PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2015-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2015-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2015-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2015-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2015-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2015-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2015-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2015-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2015-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2015-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2015-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-05-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2015-05-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-05-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2015-04-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2015-04-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2015-04-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2015-04-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2015-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2015-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2015-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2015-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-17 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2015-04-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4203&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/PDF/09900HB4203.pdf |