IL HB4195 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that endangering the life or health of a child that is a proximate cause of bodily harm to the child is a Class 4 felony (rather than a Class A misdemeanor).
Title
CRIM CD-ENDANGERING LIFE-CHILD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Tabled |
2018-04-12 | House | Tabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g)-5 |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Do Not Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 003-002-000; -SUBCOMMITTEE |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-04-09 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2017-12-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-21.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12C-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4195&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4195.htm |