IL HB4190 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that before a township may submit a proposition or referendum to abolish a road district under the Code, the township shall prepare, through an independent entity, a cost study demonstrating that the abolishment is cost efficient and that the township is capable of carrying out its required duties and responsibilities on the date of abolishment. Defines "independent entity". Effective January 1, 2019.
Title
HGHWY CD-ABOLISH ROAD DISTRICT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-02-14 | House | To Government Consolidation Analysis Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2017-12-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 5 | 6-134 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
605 | 5 | 6-135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4190&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4190.htm |