IL HB4190 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-01 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 067-001-032
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-01 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 067-001-032
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Office of the Architect of the Capitol for its FY16 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2015.
Title
$CAPITOL ARCHITECT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 38 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 067-001-032 |
2015-07-01 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2015-07-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-07-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-06-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-06-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2015-06-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-06-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-04-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2015-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2015-04-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |