IL HB4166 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - Item Veto Stands 99-0007
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - Item Veto Stands 99-0007
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Labor for its FY16 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2015.
Title
$DEPT LABOR-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 46 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 46 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-16 | House | Item Veto Stands 99-0007 |
2015-06-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Item Veto June 30, 2015 |
2015-06-30 | House | Governor Item Veto PA 99-0007 |
2015-06-30 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2015 |
2015-06-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-06-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-019-002 |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Motion Withdrawn Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-019-002 |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2015 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-046-003 |
2015-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2015-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2015-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-05-27 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-04-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2015-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2015-04-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |